Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Molo

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1833Born
30 Jun 185522.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Mar 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
20 Sep 188754.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland
20 Sep 188754.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
2 Oct 188754.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
15 Mar 190470.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Molo (VIAF: 316739304)
Bishop Vincenzo Molo (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellinzona

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173, and Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017