Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Maurice Abbet

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1845Born
26 Jul 187024.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 189549.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 Oct 189550.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 Oct 189550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
2 Feb 189650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
26 Feb 190155.4SucceededBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
11 Jul 191872.8DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jules-Maurice Abbet (VIAF: 314873891)
Bishop Jules-Maurice Abbet (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBex, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sion, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 509, and Page 568
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017