Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Recrosio, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1657Born
15 Mar 168022.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
21 Sep 168022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
23 Jun 172769.6SelectedBishop of Nice, France
30 Jul 172769.7ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
21 Sep 172769.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
21 May 173274.5DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond Recrosio
Bishop Raymond Recrosio B. (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerceil

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 287
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast