Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdu Massei

Deceased

Bishop of Nebbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1695BornBastia
29 May 174145.9AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
4 Jun 174145.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
176367.5DiedBishop of Nebbio, France

MicroData Summary for Romualdu Massei:
Bishop Romualdu Massei (born ) Bishop of Nebbio

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013