Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Valignani, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1663BornChieti
17 Feb 167916.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Jan 168622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Apr 172259.1AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
26 Apr 172259.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
Feb 1737³73.9DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Valignani:
Archbishop Filippo Valignani O.P. (born , died Feb 1737) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015