Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavao Butorac

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1888Born
17 Jul 191022.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 193849.7AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
6 Mar 193849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
25 Sep 195062.4AppointedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
22 Nov 196678.6DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pavao Butorac
Bishop Pavao Butorac (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerast

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast