Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petar Čule

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

Titular Archbishop of Giufi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1898Born
20 Jun 192022.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 194244.1AppointedBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
4 Oct 194244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
14 Sep 198082.5RetiredBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
14 Sep 198082.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Giufi
29 Jul 198587.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Petar Čule
Archbishop Petar Čule (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKruševo

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast