Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Willem Nicolaysen Gran, O.C.S.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oslo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1920BornBergen
21 May 195737.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
27 Dec 196242.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oslo, Norway
27 Dec 196242.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Raphia
24 Mar 196343.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raphia
25 Nov 196444.6SucceededBishop of Oslo, Norway
26 Nov 198363.6ResignedBishop of Oslo, Norway
20 Mar 200888.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Oslo, Norway

MicroData Summary for John Willem Nicolaysen Gran:
Bishop John Willem Nicolaysen Gran O.C.S.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oslo

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013