Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Giamporcaro

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1787Born
13 Mar 184355.3SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
19 Jun 184355.6ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
25 Jun 184355.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
20 May 184456.5SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
17 Jun 184456.6ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
2 Jan 185466.1DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Giamporcaro (VIAF: 88999871)
Bishop Luigi Giamporcaro (born , died ) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cataldo
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 231, and Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast