Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Sardi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Vera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1797¹Born
7 Apr 184346.2AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Moldavia
7 Apr 184346.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vera
30 Apr 184346.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vera
9 Nov 184851.8DiedApostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Moldavia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Sardi
Bishop Paolo Sardi O.F.M. Conv. (born 1797, died ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Moldavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItaly

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast