Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel’ Angelo Sorrentino

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1785³Born
11 Jun 180823.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 184357.8SelectedBishop of Marsi, Italy
19 Jun 184358.1ConfirmedBishop of Marsi, Italy
25 Jun 184358.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
17 Apr 186377.9DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel’ Angelo Sorrentino
Bishop Michel’ Angelo Sorrentino (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni a Piro
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast