Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olivier-Gabriel de Lubières (Nubières) du Bouchet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660¹Born
11 Jul 171050.5SelectedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
26 Jan 171151.0ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
29 Mar 171151.2Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
1739²79.0ResignedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
9 Sep 174080.6DiedBishop Emeritus of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Olivier-Gabriel de Lubières (Nubières) du Bouchet
Bishop Olivier-Gabriel de Lubières (Nubières) du Bouchet (born 1660, died ) Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pourçain-sur-Sioule

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast