Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honoré Quiqueran de Beaujeu

Deceased

Bishop of Castres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1655Born
11 Apr 170549.8SelectedBishop of Castres, France
7 Sep 170550.2ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
25 Oct 170550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castres, France
26 Jun 173681.0DiedBishop of Castres, France

MicroData Summary for Honoré Quiqueran de Beaujeu
Bishop Honoré Quiqueran de Beaujeu (born , died ) Bishop of Castres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArles

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast