Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Pierre de La Tour du Pin-Montauban

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1676¹BornValence
26 Sep 171236.7AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
6 Nov 171236.8Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
12 Sep 173761.6DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Pierre de La Tour du Pin-Montauban:
Bishop Louis-Pierre de La Tour du Pin-Montauban (born 1676, died ) Bishop of Toulon

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015