Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Trinidad González Rodríguez

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Menefessi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1943 Born
2 Apr 197228.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 199753.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
21 Feb 199753.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Menefessi
19 Mar 199753.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Menefessi
21 Apr 201571.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José Trinidad González Rodríguez
Bishop José Trinidad González Rodríguez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJesús María
Ordained Bishopauditorio Benito Juárez, Guadalupe, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,940
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast