Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Dios Mataflorida Pueblos

Deceased

Bishop of Butuan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1943Born
30 Mar 196825.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 198542.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
29 Apr 198542.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
24 Jun 198542.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
3 Feb 198743.9AppointedBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines
27 Nov 199552.7AppointedBishop of Butuan, Philippines
21 Oct 201774.6DiedBishop of Butuan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan de Dios Mataflorida Pueblos
Bishop Juan de Dios Mataflorida Pueblos (born , died ) Bishop of Butuan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoon
Death PlaceCardinal Santos Medical Center, San Juan City, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast