Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Xavier Ghanbodè Gnonhossou, S.M.A.

Bishop of Dassa-Zoumé, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1961 Born
6 Dec 199635.0Perpetual VowsMember of Society of African Missions
26 Jul 199735.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
12 Feb 201553.1AppointedBishop of Dassa-Zoumé, Benin
28 Mar 201553.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dassa-Zoumé, Benin

MicroData Summary for François Xavier Ghanbodè Gnonhossou
Bishop François Xavier Ghanbodè Gnonhossou S.M.A. (born ) Bishop of Dassa-Zoumé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDassa-Zoumé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dassa-Zoumé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 1 Mar 2015
  • c2: CB, 26 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 29 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast