Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serafino Milani, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pontremoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Side


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1819Born
27 Jul 183516.2ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
24 Sep 184223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 Jan 187454.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Syria
23 Jan 187454.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
25 Jan 187454.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
21 Dec 187455.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pontremoli, Italy
Jan 1889³69.6ResignedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
11 Feb 188969.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
11 Feb 190686.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Pontremoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Serafino Milani
Archbishop Serafino Milani O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pontremoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrara
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112, and Page 517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 560
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017