Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Josip Stepan Garić, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Banjaluka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1870BornVitez
30 Jul 189322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Nov 191242.1SelectedBishop of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
14 Dec 191242.1ConfirmedBishop of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
20 Feb 191342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
30 Jun 194675.7DiedBishop of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Josip Stepan Garić:
Bishop Emmanuel Josip Stepan Garić O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Banjaluka

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 8
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013