Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alojzije Stjepan Mišić, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1859Born
187414.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jul 188222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Apr 191252.4AppointedBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Jun 191252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
26 Mar 194282.3DiedBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Alojzije Stjepan Mišić (VIAF: 305538975)
Bishop Alojzije Stjepan Mišić O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGradiska

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast