Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Joyce Kenney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Hólar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1930Born
2 Jun 195625.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 198352.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
25 Mar 198352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
10 May 198352.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
30 Aug 199060.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Joyce Kenney
Bishop Lawrence Joyce Kenney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Rockelle

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018