Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irineu Gassen, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1942 Born
2 Feb 196623.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
27 Jul 196825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 May 200865.5AppointedBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jul 200865.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
24 Aug 200865.7InstalledBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 May 201875.4RetiredBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Irineu Gassen
Bishop Irineu Gassen O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Vacaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz do Sul, Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santa Cruz do Sul, Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vacaria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,937
  • r: Bollettino, 9 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jul 2018

Quantcast