Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Rotoli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1869Born
28 Mar 191647.1AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
21 May 191647.2Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
27 Apr 193263.1DiedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Rotoli
Bishop Nicola Rotoli O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia e Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePignataro Maggiore

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • c2/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast