Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Berutti, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pengpu [Bengbu]

Titular Bishop of Cusae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1888BornSalussola, Italy
190920.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
7 Sep 192233.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Dec 192941.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pengpu [Bengbu], China
19 Dec 192941.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cusae
8 Jun 193041.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cusae
1933²44.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Pengpu [Bengbu], China
21 Jan 197586.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pengpu [Bengbu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Berutti:
Bishop Tommaso Berutti S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pengpu [Bengbu]

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013