Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Claudio Gamalero González

Deceased

Bishop of Escuintla, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1930Born
6 May 196130.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 198655.8AppointedPrelate of Escuintla, Guatemala
10 May 198655.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Escuintla, Guatemala
28 Jul 199464.1AppointedBishop of Escuintla, Guatemala
3 Apr 200473.8DiedBishop of Escuintla, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Fernando Claudio Gamalero González
Bishop Fernando Claudio Gamalero González (born , died ) Bishop of Escuintla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad de Guatemala

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast