Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne Blanquet de Rouville

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

Titular Bishop of Numida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1768Born
24 Jun 179224.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 182859.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
28 Jan 182859.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Numida
16 Mar 182859.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numida
3 Nov 183870.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne Blanquet de Rouville
Bishop Etienne Blanquet de Rouville (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarvejols

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast