Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Fraser (Frazer)

Deceased

Bishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1779²BornCraskie in Glencannish, Great Britain
8 Jan 180425.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 182546.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nova Scotia, Canada
3 Jun 182546.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
24 Jun 182748.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
15 Feb 184263.1AppointedBishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 Sep 184465.7AppointedBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 Nov 184465.9InstalledBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
4 Oct 185172.8DiedBishop of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Fraser (Frazer):
Bishop William Fraser (Frazer) (died ) Bishop of Arichat

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 89, and Page 210
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013