Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beniamino Ubaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1882Born
22 Sep 190623.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 193249.3AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
29 Jun 193249.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
14 Jan 196582.1DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Ubaldi
Bishop Beniamino Ubaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamoli

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 May 2020

Quantcast