Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Michal Juszyński

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1793BornBieliny
28 Oct 181623.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 185965.6AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
10 Jul 185965.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
24 Nov 188087.2DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Michal Juszyński:
Bishop Józef Michal Juszyński (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 499

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013