Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vicente de Paula Ferreira, C.SS.R.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Castra Nova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1970 Born
12 Dec 199222.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Nov 199626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Mar 201746.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Mar 201746.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
27 May 201746.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Nova

MicroData Summary for Vicente de Paula Ferreira
Father Vicente de Paula Ferreira C.SS.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraraí, Diocese of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo
Ordained BishopSão José, Church, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017