Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Ferreira de Melo

Deceased

Bishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1873Born
26 Feb 189824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
15 Mar 192147.5AppointedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Sep 192148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 Oct 192148.1InstalledBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Sep 194067.0DiedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Ferreira de Melo
Bishop Joaquim Ferreira de Melo (born , died ) Bishop of Pelotas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrato

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,921, Number 70
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast