Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Quintino Rodrigues de Oliveira e Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Crato, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1863BornQuixeramobim
19 Jun 188622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
17 Feb 191349.3AppointedBishop of Piaui, Brazil
10 Mar 191551.4AppointedBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
31 Oct 191552.0Ordained BishopBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
25 Mar 191652.4InstalledBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
29 Dec 1929³66.2DiedBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Quintino Rodrigues de Oliveira e Silva:
Bishop Quintino Rodrigues de Oliveira e Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Crato

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 71
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013