Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Fernández-Conde y García del Rebollar

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1909Born
17 Mar 193424.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 195949.4AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
8 Mar 195949.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
1 Jan 197060.3DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Fernández-Conde y García del Rebollar
Bishop Manuel Fernández-Conde y García del Rebollar (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuertollano

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast