Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura Malayo Famadico

Bishop of San Pablo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1956 BornBanton, Romblon
25 Oct 198327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Calapan, Philippines
6 Apr 200245.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lipa, Philippines
6 Apr 200245.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
19 Jun 200245.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
11 Jun 200346.9AppointedBishop of Gumaca, Philippines
14 Jul 200347.0InstalledBishop of Gumaca, Philippines
25 Jan 201356.5AppointedBishop of San Pablo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Malayo Famadico:
Bishop Buenaventura Malayo Famadico (born ) Bishop of San Pablo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Pablo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,202
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013