Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas Benson Okoye

Auxiliary Bishop of Awka, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Masclianae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1963 Born
29 Aug 199229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Awka, Nigeria
30 May 201451.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Awka, Nigeria
30 May 201451.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Masclianae
29 Aug 201451.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Masclianae

MicroData Summary for Jonas Benson Okoye
Bishop Jonas Benson Okoye (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Awka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaduna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Awka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast