Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Patrick Ellison, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of Banjul, Gambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1942 Born
196825.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Jul 196927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
25 Feb 200664.0AppointedBishop of Banjul, Gambia
14 May 200664.2Ordained BishopBishop of Banjul, Gambia
30 Nov 201775.7RetiredBishop of Banjul, Gambia

MicroData Summary for Robert Patrick Ellison
Bishop Robert Patrick Ellison C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Banjul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopIndependence Stadium, Bakau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banjul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,154
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast