Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bomadi

Dioecesis Bomadiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Hyacinth Oroko Egbebo, M.S.P.N., Bishop
  • Thomas Vincent Greenan, S.P.S., Superior Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 September 2017
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Benin City
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 13,140 (5,075 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bomadivicariate.com/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Our Lady of the Waters Cathedral, P.O. Box 720, Bomadi, Ughelli, Delta State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (080)360.03.081

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bomadi
17 March 1991ErectedDiocese of Port Harcourt
Diocese of Warri
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bomadi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bomadi
15 December 1996ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Bomadi Vicariate Apostolic of Bomadi
Diocese of Bomadi
21 September 2017ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bomadi Diocese of Bomadi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bomadi
199915,8001,617,0001.0%73101,580366ap2000
200015,9501,700,000.9%123151,063326ap2001
200116,0001,767,000.9%93121,33348ap2002
200319,0001,836,0001.0%151161,187239ap2004
201027,3652,658,0001.0%175221,2437419ap2011
201432,8732,867,0001.1%25934966105023ap2015
Diocese of Bomadi

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.2.0, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 22 Sep 2017