Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Fernandes

Bishop Emeritus of Bareilly, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1936 Born
2 Dec 196428.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 198952.5AppointedBishop of Bareilly, India
29 Mar 198952.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bareilly, India
11 Jul 201478.0RetiredBishop of Bareilly, India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Fernandes
Bishop Anthony Fernandes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bareilly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalathur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bareilly.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,570
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast