Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Menezes

Bishop Emeritus of Ajmer, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1936 Born
21 Dec 196327.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 197842.8AppointedBishop of Ajmer and Jaipur, India
17 Feb 197943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ajmer and Jaipur, India
3 Nov 201276.8RetiredBishop of Ajmer, India
31 Jan 201377.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Allahabad, India
3 Dec 201377.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Menezes
Bishop Ignatius Menezes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ajmer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ajmer.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2005
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast