Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Charles Morlino

Deceased

Bishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1946Born
1 Jun 197427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Oct 198336.8IncardinatedPriest of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
6 Jul 199952.5AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
21 Sep 199952.7Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
23 May 200356.3AppointedBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
1 Aug 200356.5InstalledBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
24 Nov 201871.8DiedBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Charles Morlino (VIAF: 311152247)
Bishop Robert Charles Morlino (born , died ) Bishop of Madison

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScranton, PA, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Helena, Cathedral, Helena, Diocese of Helena, Montana
Death PlaceSt. Mary, Hospital, Madison, Diocese of Madison, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,619

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 25 Nov 2018

Quantcast