Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Tonizza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tripolitana

Titular Bishop of Paraetonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1866BornCelleno, Italy
17 Dec 189832.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Aug 191953.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Libia, Libya
7 Aug 191953.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
2 Nov 191953.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
3 Feb 192760.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tripolitana, Libya
16 Apr 193568.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Tripolitana, Libya

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Tonizza:
Bishop Giacinto Tonizza O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tripolitana

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013