Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Arduino Terzi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apuania

Titular Bishop of Diocletiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1884BornCapradosso
25 May 190722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 May 193449.6AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
25 Jul 193449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
10 Jul 194560.8ResignedBishop of Apuania, Italy
10 Jul 194560.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
11 Jul 197186.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Apuania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Arduino Terzi:
Bishop Cristoforo Arduino Terzi O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apuania

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1972
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013