Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael von Deinlein

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1800BornNeunkirchen
18 Sep 182423.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bamberg, Germany
18 Nov 182424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
17 Apr 185352.5SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
27 Jun 185352.7ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
27 Jun 185352.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
20 Nov 185353.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
20 Jan 185655.2SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
19 Jul 185655.7ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
3 Sep 185655.9InstalledBishop of Augsburg, Germany
19 Jun 185857.6SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
27 Sep 185857.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
10 Nov 185858.0InstalledArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
4 Jan 187574.2DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael von Deinlein:
Archbishop Michael von Deinlein (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 75, and Page 131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013