Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice John Dingman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Des Moines, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1914Born
8 Dec 193925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Davenport, Iowa, USA
2 Apr 196854.2AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
19 Jun 196854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
7 Jul 196854.4InstalledBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
14 Oct 198672.7ResignedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
1 Feb 199278.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Des Moines, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Maurice John Dingman (VIAF: 67275177)
Bishop Maurice John Dingman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Des Moines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWest Point, IA, Diocese of Davenport, Iowa
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast