Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerian Joseph de Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1884Born
25 Jul 191328.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 192843.3AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
15 Apr 192843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mangalore, India
14 Aug 193045.9DiedBishop of Mangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Valerian Joseph de Souza
Bishop Valerian Joseph de Souza (born , died ) Bishop of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarwar

  • a priest for 17.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast