Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrés de Orbe y Larreátegui

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1672BornErmúa
27 Feb 171845.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172048.7AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
2 Feb 172148.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
18 Apr 172553.0AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
13 Jun 172553.2InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
26 Jan 173865.8ResignedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
7 Mar 174067.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Orbe y Larreátegui:
Archbishop Andrés de Orbe y Larreátegui (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114, and Page 403
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 39, Number 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015