Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Marimón Corbera

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1679²Born
16 Dec 172041.9AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
1 May 172142.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
16 Jan 174465.0DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Marimón Corbera
Bishop Ramón Marimón Corbera (born 1679, died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 39, Number 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast