Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Casado Torreblanca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1682BornLucena
5 May 173856.0AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
3 Jun 173856.1Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
12 May 174765.1ResignedBishop of Urgell, Spain
5 Jul 174967.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jorge Casado Torreblanca:
Bishop Jorge Casado Torreblanca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Urgell

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013