Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Deng Majak

Deceased

Bishop of Wau, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1940Born
20 Nov 197030.0Ordained PriestPriest of Rumbek, South Sudan
12 Apr 199251.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wau, South Sudan
2 Nov 199555.0AppointedBishop of Wau, South Sudan
11 Feb 199655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wau, South Sudan
6 Mar 201776.3DiedBishop of Wau, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Deng Majak
Bishop Rudolf Deng Majak (born , died ) Bishop of Wau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAkwac
Death PlaceBerlin, Archdiocese of Berlin, Germany

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,707
  • d/c1: CB, 7 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017