Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Dendinger

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1939 Born
29 May 196526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
14 Oct 200465.4AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
13 Dec 200465.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
14 Jan 201575.6RetiredBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Dendinger
Bishop William Joseph Dendinger (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColeridge

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand Island.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,726
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast